Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-509
No. 15-509
Title:
Tata Consultancy Services Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
County of Orange, California
Docketed:October 20, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-72343)
  Decision Date:April 16, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 16 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2015)
Nov 18 2015 Brief of respondent County of Orange, California in opposition filed.
Dec 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
William Alfred Escobar 101 Park Avenue 212 808 7771
    Counsel of RecordNew York, NY  10178
wescobar@kelleydrye.com
Party name: Tata Consultancy Services Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Allan Lawrence Schare Theodora Oringher PC(310) 557-2009
    Counsel of Record1840 Century Park East, Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA  90067
aschare@tocounsel.com
Party name: County of Orange, California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543