Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 06-566
No. 06-566
Title:
Edo George Mbaba, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Societe Air France
Docketed:October 25, 2006
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(05-20452)
  Decision Date:July 25, 2006

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 23 2006 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2006)
Nov 24 2006 Brief of respondent Societe Air France in opposition filed.
Dec 4 2006 Reply of petitioners Edo George Mbaba, et ux. filed.
Dec 6 2006 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007.
Jan 8 2007 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Jeffrey Lee Dorrell 3303 Louisiana(713)-807-1188
Suite 150
Houston, TX  77006-6616
Party name: Edo George Mbaba, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondent:
G. Byron Sims Brown Sims, PC(713) 629-1580
1177 West Loop South
Tenth Floor
Houston, TX  77027-9007
Party name: Societe Air France

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543