Docket for 06-562
No. 06-562 | |
Title: |
United States, Petitioner |
v. |
Atlantic Research Corporation |
|
Docketed: | October 24, 2006 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 24 2006 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2006) |
Nov 22 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Aviall Services, Inc. filed. |
Dec 6 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 5, 2007. |
Dec 8 2006 |
Response Requested . (Due January 8, 2007) |
Jan 2 2007 |
Brief of respondent Atlantic Research Corporation in support filed. |
Jan 3 2007 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2007. |
Jan 9 2007 |
Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 19 2007 |
Petition GRANTED. |
Feb 5 2007 |
SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, April 23, 20007. |
Feb 22 2007 |
Record received from U.S.C.A. for 8th Circuit. (1 envelope) |
Mar 1 2007 |
Joint appendix filed. |
Mar 1 2007 |
Brief of petitioner United States filed. |
Mar 2 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Huron Valley Steel Corporation filed. |
Mar 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Cooper Industries, LLC, et al. filed. |
Mar 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Reading Company filed. |
Mar 20 2007 |
Record received from U.S.D.C. for Western District of Arkansas. (1 envelope) |
Mar 21 2007 |
CIRCULATED. |
Mar 30 2007 |
Motion of Washington, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. |
Apr 4 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Ford Motor Company and General Motors Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 4 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Former Administrator Carol M. Browner, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of City of New York filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Lockheed Martin Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief of respondent Atlantic Research Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Mayors filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of James Kotrous filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Superfund Settlements Project, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 5 2007 |
Brief amicus curiae of Aviall Services, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 13 2007 |
Motion of Washington, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
Apr 13 2007 |
Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 23 2007 |
Argued. For petitioner: Thomas G. Hungar, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Owen T. Armstrong, Jr., Milwaukee, Wis.; and Jay D. Geck, Deputy Solicitor General, Olympia, Wash. (for Washington, et al., as amici curiae.) |
Jun 11 2007 |
Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. |
Jul 13 2007 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
Jul 25 2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt (07/17/07) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit received. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Paul D. Clement |
Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record |
United States Department of Justice | |
| 950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20530-0001 | |
| SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov |
Party name: United States |
| | |
Thomas G. Hungar |
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
| 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| thungar@gibsondunn.com |
Party name: United States |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
O. Thomas Armstrong Jr. |
Von Briesen & Roper | |
Counsel of Record | 411 East Wisconsin Ave. | |
| Suite 700 | |
| Milwaukee, WI 53202 | |
Party name: Atlantic Research Corporation |
| | |
Frank L. Steeves |
von Briesen & Roper | (414) 276-1122 |
| 411 W. Wisconsin Ave. | |
| Suite 700 | |
| Milwaukee, WI 53202 | |
Party name: Atlantic Research Corporation |
Other: | | |
Miguel A. Estrada |
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
| 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| mestrada@gibsondunn.com |
Party name: Lockheed Martin Corporation |
| | |
Richard Faulk |
Gardere Wynne Sewel LLP | (214) 999-3000 |
| 3000 Thanksgiving Tower | |
| Dallas, TX 75201-4761 | |
Party name: Aviall Services, Inc. |
| | |
Jay D. Geck |
Deputy Solicitor General | (360) 586-2697 |
|
Washington Office of Attorney General | |
| 1125 Washington Street, SE | |
| Olympia, WA 98504-0100 | |
| jay.geck@atg.wa.gov |
Party name: Washington, et al. |
| | |
Joel M. Gross |
Arnold & Porter LLP | (202) 942-5000 |
| 555 Twelfth Street, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20004 | |
Party name: Former Administrator Carol M. Browner, et al. |
| | |
Paul E. Gutermann |
1333 New Hampshire Ave., N.W. | (202) 887-4088 |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
Party name: United States Conference of Mayors |
| | |
Stephen B. Kinnaird |
Paul Hastings LLP | (202) 551-1700 |
| 875 15th Street, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
| stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com |
Party name: Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. |
| | |
Leonard J. Koerner |
New York City Law Department | (212) 356-2500 |
| 100 Church Street, 6th Floor | |
| New York, NY 10007 | |
| lkoerner@law.nyc.gov |
Party name: City of New York |
| | |
Mark I. Levy |
Kilpatrick Stockton, LLP | (202) 824-1437 |
| 607 14th Street, NW | |
| Suite 900 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
| mlevy@kilpatrickstockton.com |
Party name: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. |
| | |
James C. Martin |
Reed Smith LLP | (412) 288-3131 |
| 225 Fifth Avenue | |
| Suite 1200 | |
| Pittsburgh, PA 15222 | |
| jcmartin@reedsmith.com |
Party name: Reading Company |
| | |
Jacqueline Leigh McDonald |
813 Sixth Street Third Floor | (916)-446-7979 |
| Sacramento, CA 95814 | |
Party name: James Kotrous |
| | |
John McGahren |
Patton Boggs LLP | (973) 848-5600 |
| Newark, NJ 07102 | |
Party name: Ford Motor Company and General Motors Corporation |
| | |
Jerry S. Phillips |
Loeb 7 Loeb LLP | (310) 282-2228 |
| 10100 Santa Monica Blvd Suite 2200 | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90067-4120 | |
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council, et al. |
| | |
Harvey M. Sheldon |
222 North LaSalle Street | (312) 704-3000 |
| Chicago, IL 60601 | |
Party name: Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago |
| | |
Jack D. Shumate |
Stoneridge West 41000 Woodward Avenue | (248)-258-1405 |
| Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 | |
Party name: Huron Valley Steel Corporation |
| | |
Michael W. Steinberg |
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | (202) 739-5141 |
| Washington, DC 20004 | |
Party name: Superfund Settlement Project, et al. |
| | |
Dale Edward Stephenson |
4900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square | (216) 479-8500 |
| Cleveland, OH 44114-1304 | |
Party name: Cooper Industries, LLC, et al. |
| | |
Paul S. Weiland |
18101 Von Karman Ave., Suite 1800 | (949) 833-7800 |
| Irvine, CA 92612 | |
Party name: Association of California Water Agencies, et al. |