Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 01-506
No. 01-506 Status: DECIDED
Title: Lockheed Martin Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Space Systems/Loral, Inc.
Docketed:          Lower Ct: United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
September 25, 2001 (00-1310)

~~Date~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 21 2001Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2001)
Oct 4 2001Waiver of right of respondent Space Systems/Loral, Inc. to respond
filed.
Oct 10 2001 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 26, 2001
Oct 15 2001 Response requested.
Nov 9 2001Brief of respondent Space Systems/Loral, Inc. in opposition filed.
Nov 20 2001 REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 7, 2001
Dec 5 2001Reply brief of petitioner Lockheed Martin Corporation filed.
May 28 2002 REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2002
Jun 3 2002 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further
consideration in light of Festo Corp. v. Shoketsu Kinzoku Kogyo
Kabushiki Co., 535 U.S. ____ (2002).
********************************************************
Jul 3 2002 JUDGMENT ISSUED.
 


~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Edward V. Filardi Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher 2127353000
Four Times Square
New York, NY 10036
Party name: Lockheed Martin Corp.
 
Attorneys for Respondent:
James H. Wallace Jr. Wiley, Rein & Fielding 2027197000
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006
Party name: Space Systems/Loral, Inc.
 
 

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543