Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A87
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A87
Title:The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, New York, Applicant
v.
Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of New York
Docketed:November 12, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3590)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2020Application (20A87) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Response to application (20A87) requested by Justice Breyer, due Wednesday, November 18, by 2 p.m.
Nov 16 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 17 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by First Liberty Institute.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Medical Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 18 2020Response to application from respondent Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of New York filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Nov 19 2020Letter of respondent Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of New York received.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 19 2020Reply of The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, New York in support of application not accepted for filing. (November 19, 2020)
Nov 19 2020Reply of applicant the Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, New York filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 25 2020Application (20A87) referred to the Court.
Nov 25 2020Application (20A87) granted by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to JUSTICE BREYER and by him referred to the Court is granted. Respondent is enjoined from enforcing Executive Order 202.68’s 10- and 25-person occupancy limits on applicant pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GORSUCH, concurring. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, concurring.(Detached Opinion). CHIEF JUSTICE ROBERTS, dissenting. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE BREYER, with whom JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR and JUSTICE KAGAN join, dissenting. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, with whom JUSTICE KAGAN joins,dissenting. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randy Michael Mastro
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue, 48th Floor
New York, NY 10166

rmastro@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Attorneys for Respondent
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Governor Andrew M. Cuomo, in his official capacity
Other
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Henry Clay Quillen
    Counsel of Record
Whatley Kallas LLP
152 West 57th Street
41st Floor
New York, NY 10019

hquillen@whatleykallas.com
2124477060
Party name: American Medical Association
Henry Clay Quillen
    Counsel of Record
Whatley Kallas LLP
152 West 57th Street
41st Floor
New York, NY 10019

hquillen@whatleykallas.com
2124477060
Party name: Medical Society of the State of New York
Henry Clay Quillen
    Counsel of Record
Whatley Kallas LLP
152 West 57th Street
41st Floor
New York, NY 10019

hquillen@whatleykallas.com
2124477060
Party name: American Medical Association; Medical Society of the State of New York
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Plano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543