Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-9535 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-9535 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John William King, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70018)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Proof of service for respondent's motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jul 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2018.
Aug 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 24, 2018.
Oct 04 2018Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Reply of petitioner John King filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 MAGEE AVE
MILL VALLEY, CA 94941-4532

a.r.ellis@att.net
4153896771
Party name: John King
Attorneys for Respondent
Katherine Diane Hayes
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Texas
PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711

katherine.hayes@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1400
Party name: Lorie Davis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543