SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
45 items found. Page: 1 of 7 for your search: garcetti
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
18-12 Kennedy v. Bremerton School Dist. (01/22/2019)
Cite as: 586 U. S. ____ (2019) 1 Statement of ALITO, J. SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES JOSEPH A. KENNEDY v. BREMERTON SCHOOL DISTRICT ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE UNITED STATES COURT
Order List (01/22/2019)
(ORDER LIST: 586 U.S.) TUESDAY, JANUARY 22, 2019 ORDERS IN PENDING CASES 18A625 TRUMP, PRESIDENT OF U.S., ET AL. V. KARNOSKI, RYAN, ET AL. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by
Argument Transcripts
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Heritage Reporting Corporation provides the oral argument transcripts that are posted on this website on the
Garcetti
v. Ceballos (Reargued)
597us2r62_d92h.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 597 U. S. Part 2 Pages 507–579 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT June 27, 2022 REBECCA A. WOMELDORF reporter of decisions Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This
13-483
Official 1 IN THE SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 2 x 3 EDWARD R. LANE, : 4 Petitioner : No. 13483 5 v. : 6 STEVE FRANKS, IN HIS : 7 INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, AND : 8 SUSAN BURROW, IN HER : 9
16-1466 Janus v. State, County, and Municipal Employees (06/27/2018)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2017 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as isbeing done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued.The
601us1r08_a8cf.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 601 U. S. Part 1 Pages 187–204 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT March 15, 2024 REBECCA A. WOMELDORF reporter of decisions Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##