SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
31 items found. Page: 1 of 5 for your search: february 19 2019
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
QPReport
1 PRESENTED BY THE PETITION. CERT. GRANTED
2/19/2019
QUESTION PRESENTED: In the Clean Water Act (CWA
Earlier Term Oral Argument Calendars
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Session Beginning October 05, 2020 (PDF) Session Beginning November 02, 2020 (PDF) Session Beginning
February 19, 2019
(PDF)
Earlier Term Day Calls
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES
Granted & Noted List OT 2018 (Revised 3/23/23)
-1 -SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES GRANTED & NOTED LIST OCTOBER TERM 2018 CASES FOR ARGUMENT June 28, 2019 (Revised 3/23/23) 16-1094 CFX REPUBLIC OF SUDAN V. HARRISON Court: USCA-2 Granted
Granted & Noted List - October Term 2018
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES OCTOBER TERM 2018 CASES FOR ARGUMENT 16-1094 CFX REPUBLIC OF SUDAN V. HARRISON
Granted & Noted List October Term 2019 (As of July 9, 2020)
Breyer Result: VACATED AND REMANDED Granted:
2/19/19
Decided: 4/23/20 Other: Kavanaugh (C); Thomas
Granted & Noted List - October Term 2019
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES Court: USCA-9 Granted:
2/19/19
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##