Docket for 05-1256
No. 05-1256 | |
Title: |
Philip Morris USA, Petitioner |
v. |
Mayola Williams, Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesse D. Williams, Deceased |
|
Docketed: | March 31, 2006 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oregon |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 30 2006 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2006) |
Apr 28 2006 |
Brief of respondent Mayola Williams in opposition filed. |
May 1 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed. |
May 1 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council filed. |
May 8 2006 |
Reply of petitioner Philip Morris USA filed. (Distributed) |
May 9 2006 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2006. |
May 30 2006 |
Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the petition. |
Jul 3 2006 |
Extension of time within which to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including July 28, 2006. |
Jul 18 2006 |
Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Jul 20 2006 |
Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including September 15, 2006. |
Jul 20 2006 |
Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the respondent. |
Jul 27 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Tort Reform Association filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Steven L. Chanenson and John Y. Gotanda filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Joint appendix filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief of petitioner Philip Morris USA filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, and Allied Educational Foundation filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Lorillard Tobacco Company filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, et al. filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of A. Mitchell Polinsky, Steven Shavell, and Cato Institute filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. |
Jul 28 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Oregon Forest Industries Council, et al. filed. |
Aug 10 2006 |
Letter from James T. Newsom, Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP, received. |
Aug 14 2006 |
SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 31, 2006. |
Aug 14 2006 |
CIRCULATED. |
Sep 14 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Trial Lawyers for Public Justice filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 14 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Center for a Just Society filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief of respondent Mayola Williams filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Neil Vidmar, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Professors Keith N. Hylton, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of Association of Trial Lawyers of America filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Henry H. Drummonds, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amicus curiae of United Policyholders filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Akhil Reed Amar and Arthur McEvoy filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 15 2006 |
Brief amici curiae of Tobacco Control Legal Consortium, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 13 2006 |
Record received from Supreme Court of Oregon. (9 boxes) |
Oct 16 2006 |
Reply of petitioner Philip Morris USA filed. |
Oct 31 2006 |
Argued. For petitioner: Andrew L. Frey, New York, N.Y. For respondent: Robert S. Peck, Washington, D.C. |
Feb 20 2007 |
Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J. and Kennedy, Souter, and Alito, JJ., joined. Stevens, J., and Thomas, J., filed dissenting opinions. Ginsburg, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined. |
Mar 26 2007 |
MANDATE ISSUED. |
Apr 11 2007 |
Record returned to Supreme Court of Oregon. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Andrew L. Frey |
Mayer Brown LLP | (212) 506-2672 |
Counsel of Record | 1675 Broadway | |
| New York, NY 10019 | |
| afrey@mayerbrown.com |
Party name: Philip Morris USA |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Robert S. Peck |
Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C. | (202) 944-2874 |
Counsel of Record | 777 6th Street, NW | |
| Suite 520 | |
| Washington, DC 20001 | |
| robert.peck@cclfirm.com |
Party name: Mayola Williams, Personal Representative of the Estate of Jesse D. Williams, Deceased |
Other: | | |
Frederick M. Baron |
Baron & Budd, PC | (214) 265-4400 |
| 5956 Sherry Lane | |
| Ste.1616 | |
| Dallas, TX 75225 | |
Party name: Neil Vidmar, et al. |
| | |
H. Christopher Bartolomucci |
Bancroft PLLC | (202) 234-0090 |
| 1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 470 | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| cbartolomucci@bancroftpllc.com |
Party name: Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers |
| | |
Steven C. Berman |
Stoll Stoll Berne Lorting & Schlachter | (503) 227-1600 |
| 209 SW Oak Street | |
| Suite 500 | |
| Portland, OR 97204 | |
Party name: Henry H. Drummonds, et al. |
| | |
Sheila L. Birnbaum |
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart | (212) 849-7000 |
| & Sullivan, LLP | |
| 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor | |
| New York, NY 10010 | |
Party name: National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, et al. |
| | |
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. |
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
| 1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council |
| | |
Brian G. Brooks |
P.O. Box 605 | (501) 733-3457 |
| Greenbrier, AR 72058 | |
| bgblawfirm@sbcglobal.net |
Party name: Center for a Just Society |
| | |
Thomas W. Brown |
Cosgrave Vergeer Kester LLP | (503) 323-9000 |
| 805 SW Broadway | |
| 8th Floor | |
| Portland, OR 97205 | |
Party name: Oregon Forest Industries Council, et al. |
| | |
Elizabeth J. Cabraser |
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP | (415) 956-1000 |
| 275 Battery Street, 30th Floor | |
| San Francisco, CA 94111-3339 | |
| ecabraser@lchb.com |
Party name: AARP, et al. |
| | |
Kenneth Chesebro |
1600 Massachusetts Ave. | (617) 661-4423 |
| No. 801 | |
| Cambridge, MA 02138 | |
| kenchesebro@msn.com |
Party name: Akhil Reed Amar and Arthur McEvoy |
| | |
Michael V. Ciresi |
Robins Kaplanj Miller & Ciresi LLP | |
| 2800 LaSalle Plaza | |
| 800 LaSalle Avenue | |
| Minneapolis, MN 55402 | |
Party name: Trial Lawyers for Public Justice |
| | |
Roy T. Englert Jr. |
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP | (202) 775-4500 |
| 1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411 | |
| Washington, DC 20006 | |
| renglert@robbinsrussell.com |
Party name: American Tort Reform Association |
| | |
Meir Feder |
Jones Day | (212) 326-3939 |
| 222 East 41st Street | |
| New York, NY 10017 | |
| mfeder@jonesday.com |
Party name: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Lorillard Tobacco Company |
| | |
Robert D. Fox |
Manko, Gold, Katcher & Fox, LLP | (484) 430-5700 |
| 401 City Avenue | |
| Suite 500 | |
| Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 | |
Party name: Steven L. Chanenson and John Y. Gotanda |
| | |
Jonathan D. Hacker |
O'Melveny & Myers LLP | (202) 383-5300 |
| 1625 Eye Street, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20006 | |
| jhacker@omm.com |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States |
| | |
Arnold R. Levinson |
Pillsbury & Levinson, LLP | (415) 433-8000 |
| Transamerica Pyramid | |
| 600 Montgomery Street, 31st Floor | |
| San Francisco, CA 94111 | |
Party name: United Policyholders |
| | |
Timothy E. Lynch |
Cato Institute | (202) 842-0200 |
| 1000 Massachusetts Avenue, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20001 | |
Party name: A. Mitchell Polinsky, Steven Shavell, and Cato Institute |
| | |
Arvin Maskin |
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP | (212) 310-8000 |
| 767 Fifth Avenue | |
| New York, NY 10153 | |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al. |
| | |
Theodore B. Olson |
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
| 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| tolson@gibsondunn.com |
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council |
| | |
Timothy M. Sandefur |
Pacific Legal Foundation | (916) 419-7111 |
| 950 G Street | |
| Sacramento, CA 95814 | |
| tsandefur@pacificlegal.org |
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation |
| | |
Gene Schaerr |
Winston & Strawn LLP | (202) 282-5000 |
| 1700 K Street, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20006 | |
| gschaerr@winston.com |
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al. |
| | |
William B. Schultz |
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP | (202) 778-1800 |
| 1800 M Street, N.W., Suite 1000 | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| wschultz@zuckerman.com |
Party name: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, et al. |
| | |
Ronald Simon |
Simon & Associates | (202) 429-0094 |
| 1707 N Street, Northwest | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
Party name: Professors Keith N. Hylton, et al. |
| | |
Gerson H. Smoger |
Smoger & Associates, P.C. | (510) 531-4529 |
| 3175 Monterey Boulevard, Suite 3 | |
| Oakland, CA 94602 | |
Party name: Association of Trial Lawyers of America |
| | |
Edward L. Sweda Jr. |
Tobacco Control Resource Center | (617) 373-2026 |
| Northeastern University School of Law | |
| 102 Fenway, Suite 117 | |
| Boston, MA 02115 | |
Party name: Tobacco Control Legal Consortium, et al. |
| | |
Mary H. Williams |
Solicitor General | (503) 378-4402 |
|
Oregon Department of Justice | |
| 1162 Court Street, NE | |
| Salem, OR 97301-4096 | |
| mary.williams@doj.state.or.us |
Party name: Oregon, et al. |