Docket for 00-191
No. 00-191 |
Status: | DECIDED |
| Title: |
Federal Election Commission, Petitioner |
| | v. |
| |
Colorado Republican Federal Campaign Committee |
Docketed: | Lower Ct: |
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
August 7, 2000 | |
(99-1211) |
~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 3 2000 | Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, |
| 2000) |
Aug 3 2000 | Appendix of petitioner filed. |
Sep 6 2000 | Brief of respondent Colorado Republican Federal Campaign Committee in |
| opposition filed. |
Sep 20 2000 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 6, 2000 |
Sep 26 2000 | Reply brief of petitioner Federal Election Commission filed. |
Oct 10 2000 | Petition GRANTED. |
| SET FOR ARGUMENT February 28, 2001. |
| ******************************************************** |
Nov 16 2000 | Order extending time to file petitioner's brief on the merits to |
| and including December 1, 2000. |
Nov 17 2000 | Order extending time to file respondent's brief on the merits to |
| and including January 12, 2001. |
Dec 1 2000 | Joint appendix filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief of petitioner Federal Election Commission filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief amicus curiae of National Voting Rights Institute filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief amici curiae of John F. Reed, et al. filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief amici curiae of Common Cause and Democracy 21 filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief amici curiae of Paul Allen Beck, et al. filed. |
Dec 1 2000 | Brief amici curiae of Missouri, et al. filed. |
Jan 11 2001 | Brief amicus curiae of Missouri Republican party filed. |
Jan 12 2001 | Brief of respondent Colorado Republic Federal Campaign Committee |
| filed. |
Jan 12 2001 | Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. |
Jan 12 2001 | Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Congressional Committee |
| filed. |
Jan 12 2001 | Brief amicus curiae of California Republican Party filed. |
Jan 18 2001 | CIRCULATED. |
Jan 19 2001 | Reply brief of petitioner Federal Election Commission filed. |
Feb 8 2001 | Record filed. |
Feb 28 2001 | ARGUED. |
Mar 19 2001 | Record filed. |
Jun 25 2001 | Adjudged to be REVERSED. SOUTER, J., delivered the opinion of the |
| Court, in which STEVENS, O'CONNOR, GINSBURG, and BREYER, JJ., |
| joined. THOMAS, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which SCALIA |
| and KENNEDY, JJ., joined, and in which REHNQUIST, C.J., joined as |
| to Part II. |
Jul 25 2001 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
Apr 1 2002 | Record returned to the USDC Dist. of Colorado. |
Apr 1 2002 | Record returned to the USCA for the Tenth circuit. |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Solicitor General | U.S. Department of Justice | |
| Washington, DC 20530 | |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Jan Witold Baran | Wiley, Rein & Fielding | |
| 1776 K Street, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20006 | |
Party name: CO Republican Fed. Campaign |
| | |
Other Attorneys: | | |
David A. Wilson | Hale & Dorr | 2029428400 |
| 1455 Pennsylvania Ave., NW | |
| Washington, DC 20004 | |
Party name: National Voting Rights Institute |
| | |
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Jenner & Block | 2026396000 |
| 601 Thirteenth Street, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
Party name: John F. Reed, et al. |
| | |
Roger M. Witten | Wilmer Cutler Pickering | 2026636000 |
| 2445 M Street, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20037 | |
Party name: Common Cause and Democracy 21 |
| | |
Burt Neuborne | Brennan Center for Justice | 2129986730 |
| 161 Avenue of the Americas | |
| New York, NY 10013 | |
Party name: Paul Allen Beck, et al. |
| | |
James R. Layton | State Solicitor | 5737513321 |
| P.O. Box 899 | |
| Jefferson City, MO 65102 | |
Party name: Missouri, et al. |
| | |
D. Bruce Lapierre | Washington University Law Sch. | 3149356477 |
| One Brookings Drive | |
| St. Louis, MO 63130-4899 | |
Party name: Missouri Republican party |
| | |
Mark J. Lopez | ACLU | 2125492500 |
| 125 Broad Street | |
| New York, NY 10004 | |
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al. |
| | |
Matthew F. Stower | Patton Boggs | 2024576000 |
| 2550 M Street, NW | |
| Washington, DC 20037 | |
Party name: National Republican Congressional Committee |
| | |
Charles H. Bell Jr. | Bell McAndrews Hiltachk Davidi | 9164427757 |
| 455 Capitol Mall, #801 | |
| Sacramento, CA 95814 | |
Party name: California Republican Party |
| | |
| | |
|