SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
500+ items found for your search:
capital punishment
Page: 1 of 72
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
QPReport
Court declines to recuse himself in a
capital
case where he had personally approved the decision to pursue
capital
punishment
against Petitioner in his prior capacity as
QuestionsReport
justice system.”4 A system which includes
capital
punishment
but does not provide a meaningful opportunity
17-8151 Bucklew v. Precythe (04/01/2019)
forbids “cruel and unusual” methods of
capital
punishment
but does not guarantee a prisoner a When it comes to determining whether a
punishment
is unconstitutionally cruel because of the pain
Order List (03/19/2018)
(ORDER LIST: 583 U.S.) MONDAY, MARCH 19, 2018 ORDERS IN PENDING CASES 17A838 TIMBES, PAMELA M. V. DEUTSCHE BANK, ET AL. The application for stay addressed to Justice Sotomayor and referred to the
22-6057 Clark v. Mississippi (06/30/2023)
the jury was deliberating about appropriate
punishment
, it had trouble reaching consensus. On the statingthey were “‘unable to agree unanimously on
punishment
’” and asking what would happen if they
597us1r56_p86b.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 597 U. S. Part 1 Pages 159–178 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT June 23, 2022 REBECCA A. WOMELDORF reporter of decisions Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This
17-1284 Apodaca v. Raemisch (10/09/2018)
SOTOMAYOR respecting the denialof certiorari. A
punishment
need not leave physical scars to be to be free from cruel and unusual
punishment
. Respondents, CDOC Executive Director Rick Raemisch and
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##