No. 23-831
Title:Constance Eileen Caswell, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:February 2, 2024
Linked with 23A447
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(21SC749)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2023Application (23A447) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Nov 17 2023Application (23A447) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 31, 2024.
Jan 31 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 4, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to April 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2024.
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2024 to May 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 2, 2024.
May 02 2024Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2024Reply of petitioner Constance Eileen Caswell filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: Constance Eileen Caswell
Attorneys for Respondent
Shannon Wells Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

shannon.stevenson@coag.gov
720-508-6749
Party name: Colorado
Other
Noah Adam Levine
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

noah.levine@wilmerhale.com
212-230-8875
Party name: National Association for Public Defense