No. 23-5456 | |
Title: | John E. Gilcrease, Petitioner v. Louisiana |
Docketed: | August 28, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (54,905-KA) |
Decision Date: | November 30, 2022 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | May 31, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 22 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2023) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Aug 30 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 14 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Sherry Watters Counsel of Record | PO Box 58769 New Orleans, LA 70158-8769 sherrywatters@yahoo.com | 5047230284 |
Party name: John Gilcrease | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Rebecca Edwards Counsel of Record | Caddo Parish District Attorney's Office 501 Texas Street Shreveport, LA 71101 redwards@caddodda.com | 318-429-7618 |
Party name: Louisiana |