No. 22-7466 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Richard Eugene Glossip, Petitioner v. Oklahoma |
Docketed: | May 4, 2023 |
Linked with 22A941 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma |
Case Numbers: | (PCD-2023-267) |
Decision Date: | April 20, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 26 2023 | Application (22A941) for stay of execution of sentence of death submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. (Justice Gorsuch is recused). |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service | |
May 01 2023 | Response to application from respondent Oklahoma filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document | |
May 04 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 5, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | |
May 05 2023 | Application (22A941) referred to the Court. |
May 05 2023 | Application (22A941) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petitions for writs of certiorari, Nos. 22-6500 and 22-7466. Should both petitions for writs of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event either petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. Justice Gorsuch took not part in the consideration or decision of this application. |
May 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2023 to July 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2023. |
Jun 05 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Nora Freeman Engstrom, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Derek Van Treese, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 05 2023 | Brief of respondent Oklahoma in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 19 2023 | Reply of petitioner Richard Glossip filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Oct 02 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Amy Pickering Knight Counsel of Record | Phillips Black, Inc. 1721 Broadway, Suite 201 Oakland, CA 94612 AMY@AMYKNIGHTLAW.COM | 520-878-8849 |
Party name: Richard Glossip | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Gentner F. Drummond Counsel of Record | Oklahoma Attorney General 313 NE 21st Street Oklahoma City, OK 73105 GENTNER.DRUMMOND@OAG.OK.GOV | 4055213921 |
Party name: Oklahoma | ||
Other | ||
Paul G. Cassell Counsel of Record | Utah Appellate Project S.J. Quinney College of Law at the University of Utah 383 S. University St. Salt Lake City, UT 84112 pgcassell.law@gmail.com | 8015855202 |
Party name: Derek Van Treese, Donna Van Treese, and Alana Mileto, and the Oklahoma District Attorneys Association | ||
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers LLP 1625 Eye Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 mvergow@omm.com | (202)-383-5300 |
Party name: Nora Freeman Engstrom, Bruce A. Green, Peter A. Joy, W. Bradley Wendel, Ronald F. Wright, And Ellen C. Yaroshefsky | ||
Seth P. Waxman Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW Washington, DC 20037 SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM | 202-663-6800 |
Party name: The Innocence Project |