No. 22-704 | |
Title: | Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner v. Steve Elster |
Docketed: | January 27, 2023 |
Linked with 22A442 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-2205) |
Decision Date: | February 24, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 31, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 17 2022 | Application (22A442) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2022 to December 29, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 18 2022 | Application (22A442) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 29, 2022. |
Dec 19 2022 | Application (22A442) to extend further the time from December 29, 2022 to January 27, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Dec 20 2022 | Application (22A442) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 27, 2023. |
Jan 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Feb 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2023 to March 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 29, 2023. |
Feb 21 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Matthew A. Handal filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2023 to April 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 11, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Katherine K. Vidal, Under Secretary of Commerce Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jonathan Ellis Taylor Counsel of Record | Gupta Wessler PLLC 2001 K Street NW Suite 850 North Washington, DC 20006 JON@GUPTAWESSLER.COM | 2028881741 |
Party name: Steve Elster | ||
Other | ||
Brian Alan Ross Counsel of Record | Ross Legal Corporation 16133 Ventura Boulevard, Penthouse Encino, CA 91436 BRIAN@ROSSLEGALCORP.COM | 8189069667 |
Party name: Matthew A. Handal |