No. 18-1334
Vide 18-1475, 18-1496, 18-1514, 18-1521
Title:Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Petitioner
v.
Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al.
Docketed:April 24, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1671, 18-1746, 18-1787)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 7, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Letter of Solicitor General received.
Main Document
May 24 2019Response to petition from respondents Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Brief of respondents Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”) in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Corporate Disclosure Statement filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondents Union de Trabajadores de la Industria Electrica y Riego, Inc. (UTIER).
Main Document
Jun 10 2019Letter of June 10, 2019 from counsel for the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Letter of June 11, 2019 from respondents Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”) filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 20 2019Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 18-1334, 18-1475, 18-1496, 18-1514 and 18-1521 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and will be set for argument in the second week of the October 2019 argument session. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue shall file an opening brief on that issue on or before Thursday, July 25, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light blue cover and are limited to 15,000 words. Parties supporting the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and challenging the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file a consolidated opening brief on or before Thursday, August 22, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light red cover and are limited to 20,000 words. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and supporting the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file a consolidated opening brief and reply on or before Thursday, September 19, 2019. The briefs are to bear a yellow cover and are limited to 13,000 words. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file with the Clerk and serve upon counsel a reply brief limited to that issue on or before 2 p.m., Tuesday, October 8, 2019. The briefs are to bear a tan cover and are limited to 6,000 words. Amicus curiae briefs challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and/or supporting the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue are to be filed on or before Thursday, August 1, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light green cover and are limited to 9,000 words. Amicus curiae briefs supporting the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and/or challenging the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue are to be filed on or before Thursday, August 29, 2019. The briefs are to bear a dark green cover and are limited to 9,000 words. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief.
Jun 20 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1334. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1334. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the fling is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 15, 2019. VIDED
Jul 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by COFINA Senior Bondholders’ Coalition.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Finanical Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2019Letter of COFINA Senior Bondholders’ Coalition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by United States.
Blanket Consent
Jul 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”).
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by The Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Aurelius Investment, LLC, Aurelius Opportunities Fund, LLC, Lex Claims, LLC, Assured Guaranty Corp., and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp.
Blanket Consent
Jul 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Title III Debtors (other than COFINA).
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Joint appendix filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief of Finanical Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief of The Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Blanket Consent
Jul 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alan Mygatt-Tauber filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRA Entities filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Aug 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed (in 18-1334). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Former Governor of Puerto Rico, Anibal Acevedo-Vila filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2019Brief of respondent Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief of respondents Aurelius Investment, LLC, Aurelius Opportunities Fund, LLC, Lex Claims, LLC, Assured Guaranty Corp., and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is located on PACER, with the exception of the appendix which was received electronically.
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Elected Officers of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Joint motion of Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al., and Union de Trabajadores de la Industria Electrica y Riego, Inc. (UTIER) for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Equally American Legal Defense and Education Fund in support of neither party filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Governors Sila M. Calderon and Alejandro Garcia Padilla filed (also in 18-1496 & 18-1514). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and the ACLU of Puerto Rico filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Virgin Islands Bar Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019U.S.D.C. District of Puerto Rico record is located on pacer. Confidential filings received in electronic format.
Aug 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Constitutional Law and Legal History filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Federal and Local Judges filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Letter Request for The Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority to be heard at oral argument on behalf of appellants on Appointments Clause issue of Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority not accepted for filing. (September 06, 2019)
Aug 29 2019Motion for divided argument filed by Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED IN PART. VIDED.
Sep 11 2019Joint motion of Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al., and Union de Trabajadores de la Industria Electrica y Riego, Inc. (UTIER) for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED IN PART. VIDED.
Sep 11 2019Motion for divided argument filed by Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority DENIED. VIDED.
Sep 11 2019Upon consideration of the August 29, 2019 motions for divided argument, a total of 80 minutes is allotted for consolidated oral argument on both questions presented, and the time is divided as follows: 20 minutes to the Financial Oversight and Management Board, 20 minutes to the Solicitor General, 30 minutes to Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al., and 10 minutes to UTIER. VIDED.
Sep 19 2019Brief of Finanical Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief of COFINA Senior Bondholders’ Coalition filed (supporting ruling on de facto officer doctrine issue). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief of The Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Reply of petitioner Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Reply of respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2019Reply of respondent Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Title III Debtors (other than COFINA) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Reply of respondent Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”) filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Reply of respondents Aurelius Investment, LLC, Aurelius Opportunities Fund, LLC, Lex Claims, LLC, Assured Guaranty Corp., and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Argued. For Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D. C. For United States: Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al.: Theodore B. Olson, Washington, D. C. For UTIER: Jessica E. Méndez-Colberg, Ponce, P. R. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

wdellinger@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Finanical Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: The Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Jessica Esther Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
P.O. Box 10779
Ponce, PR 00732

jessica@bufete-emmanuelli.com
787-848-0666
Party name: Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”)
Neal David Mollen
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

nealmollen@paulhastings.com
202-551-1738
Party name: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Title III Debtors (other than COFINA)
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Aurelius Investment, LLC, Aurelius Opportunities Fund, LLC, Lex Claims, LLC, Assured Guaranty Corp., and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp.
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: COFINA Senior Bondholders’ Coalition
Other
Anibal S. Acevedo-Vila
    Counsel of Record
Law Office Acevedo Vila
894 Munoz Rivera Ave. Suite 202
San Juan, PR 00927

acevedovila1@gmail.com
787-467-6700
Party name: Former Governor of Puerto Rico, Anibal Acevedo-Vila
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
2125492500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and the ACLU of Puerto Rico
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Former Federal and Local Judges
Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
    Counsel of Record
Hernandez Mayoral Law Offices
206 Tetuan
Suite 702
San Juan, PR 00901

jose@hernandezmayoral.com
787-607-4867
Party name: Former Governors Sila M. Calderon and Alejandro Garcia Padilla
Jose A. Hernandez-MayoralHernandez Mayoral Law Offices
206 Tetuan
Suite 702
San Juan, PR 00901

jose@hernandezmayoral.com
787-607-4867
Party name: Sila M. Calderón, Alejandro García Padilla
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: DRA Entities
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
    Counsel of Record
ML & RE Law Office
513 Juan J. Jimenez St.
San Juan, PR 00918

jorge@mlrelaw.com
7879992972
Party name: Elected Officers of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Alan Michael Mygatt-Tauber
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Alan Mygatt-Tauber
10089 Ashley Circle NW
Silverdale, WA 98383

alan@amtappeals.com
253-271-9585
Party name: Alan Mygatt-Tauber
Daniel Moshe Ortner
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dortner@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
John-Russell Bart Pate
    Counsel of Record
The Pate Law Firm
P.O. Box 890
St. Thomas, VI 00804

pate@sunlawvi.com
3407777283
Party name: Virgin Islands Bar Association
Julissa Reynoso
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

jreynoso@winston.com
212-294-4756
Party name: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan
David N. Rosen
    Counsel of Record
David Rosen & Associates PC
400 Orange Street
New Haven, CT 06511

drosen@davidrosenlaw.com
2037873513
Party name: Scholars of Constitutional Law and Legal History
Steven S. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb LLP
901 New York Avenue NW, Suite 300 East
Washington, DC 20001

srosenthal@loeb.com
(202) 618-5000
Party name: Equally American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

Anthony.Sabino@sabinolaw.com
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute