No. 17-530
Title:Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:October 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3300, 16-3303, 16-3304)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2017)
Oct 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Dec 06 2017Brief of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Feb 16 2018Brief of petitioners Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 16, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Brief amici curiae of CSX Corporation and Union Pacific Railroad Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Norfolk Southern Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 19 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Apr 02 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Apr 03 2018Reply of petitioners Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2018Argued. For petitioners: Thomas H. Dupree, Jr., Washington, D. C. For respondent: Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 955-8500
Party name: Wisconsin Central Ltd., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
M. Miller Baker
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbaker@mwe.com
202-756-8233
Party name: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Bryan Michael Killian
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Bryan.killian@morganlewis.com
2023736191
Party name: CSX Corporation and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of American Railroads, 425 3rd Street. N.W.
`
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads