Docket for 15A646
No. 15A646 | |
Title: |
New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., et al., Applicants |
v. |
Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of New York, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 17, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 15 2015 |
Application (15A646) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2016 to February 18, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Dec 18 2015 |
Application (15A646) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 18, 2016. |
|