Docket for 15A621
No. 15A621 | |
Title: |
Mark Towle, Applicant |
v. |
DC Comics |
|
Docketed: | December 14, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 10 2015 |
Application (15A621) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2015 to January 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 15 2015 |
Application (15A621) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 22, 2016. |
|