Docket for 15-9425
No. 15-9425 | |
Title: |
Charles Ray Crawford, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | May 23, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2014-KA-00175-SCT) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 18, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 18 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 22, 2016) |
May 24 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Mississippi to respond filed. |
Jun 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 9 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner and counsel for the respondent. |
Jun 16 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 27 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|