Docket for 15-8971
No. 15-8971 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Billy Joe Johnson, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | April 18, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S178272) |
Decision Date: | January 21, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 13 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 18, 2016) |
May 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Jun 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
Jun 20 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|