Docket for 15-892
No. 15-892 | |
Title: |
Lee Carroll Brooker, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | January 13, 2016 |
Linked with 15A569 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-14-0126) |
Decision Date: | July 2, 2015 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 11, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 25 2015 |
Application (15A569) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2015 to January 11, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 2 2015 |
Application (15A569) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 11, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2016) |
Feb 1 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 14, 2016. |
Feb 12 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Families Against Mandatory Minimums filed. |
Mar 14 2016 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Mar 25 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Lee Carroll Brooker filed. |
Mar 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|