Docket for 15-882
No. 15-882 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
South Carolina, Petitioner |
v. |
Kamell D. Evans |
|
Docketed: | January 11, 2016 |
Linked with 15A456 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Common Pleas of South Carolina, Greenville County |
Case Nos.: | (2006-CP-23-7719) |
Decision Date: | February 24, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | May 13, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 23 2015 |
Application (15A456) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2015 to January 3, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 26 2015 |
Application (15A456) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 3, 2016. |
Jan 4 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2016) |
Jan 29 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 11, 2016. |
Mar 10 2016 |
Brief of respondent Kamell D. Evans in opposition filed. |
Mar 10 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Kamell D. Evans. |
Mar 22 2016 |
Reply of petitioner South Carolina filed. |
Mar 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|