Docket for 15-880
No. 15-880 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
South Carolina, Petitioner, |
v. |
John Kennedy Hughey |
|
Docketed: | January 11, 2016 |
Linked with 15A454 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Common Pleas of South Carolina, Abbeville County |
Case Nos.: | (00-CP-01-212) |
Decision Date: | May 7, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 22, 2010 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | May 13, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 22 2015 |
Application (15A454) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2015 to January 3, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 26 2015 |
Application (15A454) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 3, 2016. |
Jan 4 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2016) |
Feb 1 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 11, 2016. |
Mar 11 2016 |
Brief of respondent John Kennedy Hughey in opposition filed. |
Mar 11 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent John Kennedy Hughey. |
Mar 24 2016 |
Reply of petitioner South Carolina filed. |
Mar 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|