~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 30 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 2, 2016) |
May 2 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Fair Punishment Project & Centers for Ethics filed. |
May 4 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 9, 2016. |
May 11 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 13, 2016. |
May 13 2016 |
Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. |
Jun 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
Jun 1 2016 |
Reply of petitioner David Brown filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 20 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |