Docket for 15-8772
No. 15-8772 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jack Emmit Williams, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | April 1, 2016 |
Linked with 15A789 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S073205) |
Decision Date: | August 24, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 10, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 25 2016 |
Application (15A789) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 8, 2016 to April 4, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jan 29 2016 |
Application (15A789) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 4, 2016. |
Mar 29 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 2, 2016) |
Apr 26 2016 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
May 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 31 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|