~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 12 2016 |
Application (15A733) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2016 to March 24, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Application (15A733) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 24, 2016. |
Mar 24 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 29, 2016) |
Mar 24 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party, or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Apr 22 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 31, 2016. |
Apr 28 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Alabama Appellate Court Justices and Bar Presidents filed. |
May 27 2016 |
Brief of respondents Richard F. Allen, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 14 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Doyle Lee Hamm filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 16 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Jun 28 2016 |
Record Requested . |
Jul 5 2016 |
Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit (1 envelope). |
Jul 8 2016 |
Record received from U.S.D.C. Northern District of Alabama. (3 Boxes) |
Jul 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Sep 15 2016 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Doyle Lee Hamm filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
Oct 25 2016 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Nov 15 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016. |
Nov 23 2016 |
Supplemental brief to petition for rehearing filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 5 2016 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
Mar 15 2017 |
Record returned to the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit (1 envelope). |
Mar 15 2017 |
Record returned to the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Alabama. (3 Boxes) |