~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 23 2015 |
Application (15A682) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2016 to March 24, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 30 2015 |
Application (15A682) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 24, 2016. |
Mar 24 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2016) |
Apr 20 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2016. |
May 27 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 24, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 25, 2016. |
Jul 25 2016 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Aug 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Aug 17 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Lezmond C. Mitchell filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |