Docket for 15-8635
No. 15-8635 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Donald Yeomans, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | March 22, 2016 |
Linked with 15A836 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-10-0095) |
Decision Date: | June 13, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | November 20, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 5 2016 |
Application (15A836) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2016 to March 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 10 2016 |
Application (15A836) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 19, 2016. |
Mar 18 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2016) |
Apr 6 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2016. |
May 17 2016 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
May 31 2016 |
Reply of petitioner James Donald Yeomans filed. |
Jun 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
Jun 20 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|