Docket for 15-8634
No. 15-8634 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Marvin Cannon, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida |
|
Docketed: | March 22, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC13-46) |
Decision Date: | September 24, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 17 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2016) |
Apr 21 2016 |
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
May 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 31 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|