Docket for 15-8526
No. 15-8526 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Harold Blake, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida, et al. |
|
Docketed: | March 11, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC12-2102, SC13-1065) |
Decision Date: | December 4, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 8, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 7 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2016) |
Apr 11 2016 |
Brief of respondents Florida, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 27 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|