Docket for 15-8499
No. 15-8499 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kevin James Lisle, Petitioner |
v. |
Nevada |
|
Docketed: | March 9, 2016 |
Linked with 15A722 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (55173) |
Decision Date: | June 25, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 22, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 8 2016 |
Application (15A722) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2016 to March 7, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jan 12 2016 |
Application (15A722) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 7, 2016. |
Mar 7 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 8, 2016) |
Apr 5 2016 |
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed. |
Apr 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
Apr 21 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Kevin James Lisle filed. (Distributed) |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|