Docket for 15-8405
No. 15-8405 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Antonio Lavon Doyle, Petitioner |
v. |
Nevada |
|
Docketed: | March 2, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (62807) |
Decision Date: | September 22, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 2, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 1, 2016) |
Feb 29 2016 |
Appendices filed (Volumes I-III). |
Mar 29 2016 |
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed. |
Apr 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016. |
May 2 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|