Docket for 15-8396
No. 15-8396 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
John Fitzgerald Hanson, Petitioner |
v. |
William A. Sherrod, Warden, et al. |
|
Docketed: | March 3, 2016 |
Linked with 15A638 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-5100) |
Decision Date: | August 13, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 14 2015 |
Application (15A638) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2015 to February 27, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Dec 17 2015 |
Application (15A638) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 29, 2016. |
Feb 26 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 4, 2016) |
Apr 1 2016 |
Brief of respondents William A. Sherrod, Warden, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 15 2016 |
Reply of petitioner John Fitzgerald Hanson filed. |
Apr 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|