Docket for 15-8336
No. 15-8336 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Wiggins, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | February 25, 2016 |
Linked with 15A718 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-08-1165) |
Decision Date: | May 2, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | October 23, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 6 2016 |
Application (15A718) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2016 to February 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 13 2016 |
Application (15A718) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 22, 2016. |
Feb 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 28, 2016) |
Mar 24 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2016. |
Mar 30 2016 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Apr 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016. |
Apr 21 2016 |
Record Requested . |
May 2 2016 |
Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama. The record is electronic. |
May 4 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 23 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|