Docket for 15-7988
No. 15-7988 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Hamilton, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 3, 2016 |
Linked with 15A348 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-13535) |
Decision Date: | July 15, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 27, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 5 2015 |
Application (15A348) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2015 to December 12, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Oct 8 2015 |
Application (15A348) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 24, 2016. |
Jan 25 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 4, 2016) |
Mar 4 2016 |
Brief of respondents Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 16 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Richard Hamilton filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jun 16 2016 |
Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner. |
Jun 23 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED. |
Aug 31 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner DENIED. |
|