Docket for 15-7974
No. 15-7974 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Lee Henderson, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | February 3, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70001) |
Decision Date: | June 30, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 30, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 4, 2016) |
Mar 2 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 4, 2016. |
Apr 1 2016 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Apr 13 2016 |
Reply of petitioner James Lee Henderson filed. |
Apr 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 9 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
May 16 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 19 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
May 23 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 26 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
May 31 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 2 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
Jun 6 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016. |
Mar 29 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017. |
Apr 3 2017 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Moore v. Texas, 581 U. S. ____ (2017). |
May 5 2017 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|