Docket for 15-7804
No. 15-7804 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Joseph Seferino Cordova, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | January 21, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S152737) |
Decision Date: | October 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 16 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 22, 2016) |
Feb 12 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 23, 2016. |
Mar 10 2016 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|