Docket for 15-7695
No. 15-7695 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Dickerson, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | January 12, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2012-DP-01500-SCT) |
Decision Date: | June 18, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 8, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 6 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 11, 2016) |
Feb 29 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 14, 2016. |
Mar 14 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 13, 2016. |
Mar 24 2016 |
Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. |
Apr 1 2016 |
Reply of petitioner David Dickerson filed. |
Apr 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|