Docket for 15-7624
No. 15-7624 | |
Title: |
Rodricus Crawford, Petitioner |
v. |
Louisiana |
|
Docketed: | January 6, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Louisiana |
Case Nos.: | (2015-KP-0784) |
Decision Date: | October 2, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 31 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 5, 2016) |
Feb 25 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|