Docket for 15-7503
No. 15-7503 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Joseph E. Corcoran, Petitioner |
v. |
Ron Neal, Warden |
|
Docketed: | December 23, 2015 |
Linked with 15A481 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1318) |
Decision Date: | April 14, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 11, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 26 2015 |
Application (15A481) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 9, 2015 to December 24, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Nov 4 2015 |
Application (15A481) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 24, 2015. |
Dec 18 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2016) |
Feb 2 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2016. |
Feb 22 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ron Neal, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 10 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016. |
Mar 28 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|