Docket for 15-7479
No. 15-7479 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Timothy Robert Ronk, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | December 22, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2011-DP-00410-SCT) |
Decision Date: | May 7, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 17, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 21, 2016) |
Feb 2 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2016. |
Mar 4 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 23, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Appendices "A" and "B" of Mississippi filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Timothy Robert Ronk filed. |
Mar 31 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|