Docket for 15-734
No. 15-734 | |
Title: |
Milberg LLP, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Lance Laber |
|
Docketed: | December 8, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-15812) |
Decision Date: | September 10, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 4 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2016) |
Dec 28 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2016. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief of respondent Lance Laber in opposition filed. |
Feb 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Milberg LLP, et al. filed. |
Feb 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Jun 12 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Microsoft Corp. v. Baker, 582 U. S. ___ (2017). |
Jul 21 2017 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|