Docket for 15-727
No. 15-727 | |
Title: |
City of Springfield, Illinois, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Don Norton, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 4, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3581) |
Decision Date: | August 7, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 8, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 1 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2016) |
Jan 4 2016 |
Brief of respondents Don Norton, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 13 2016 |
Reply of petitioners City of Springfield, Illinois, et al. filed. |
Jan 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|