Docket for 15-7246
No. 15-7246 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Robert Leslie Roberson, III, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | December 4, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70033) |
Decision Date: | August 10, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 2 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2016) |
Dec 31 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Jan 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|