Docket for 15-7140
No. 15-7140 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Von Clark Davis, Petitioner |
v. |
Ohio |
|
Docketed: | November 27, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Ohio, Butler County |
Case Nos.: | (CA2012-12-258) |
Decision Date: | September 9, 2013 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 28, 2015) |
Dec 22 2015 |
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
Jan 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016. |
Jan 25 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|