~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 2 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 2, 2015) |
Nov 2 2015 |
Application (15A478) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Brief of respondent Cindy Griffith, Warden in opposition filed. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Response to application from respondent Cindy Griffith, Warden filed. |
Nov 3 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ernest Lee Johnson filed. |
Nov 3 2015 |
Reply of applicant Ernest Lee Johnson filed. |
Nov 3 2015 |
Application (15A478) referred to the Court. |
Nov 3 2015 |
Application (15A478) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. |
Nov 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2015. |
Dec 7 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |