Docket for 15-6583
No. 15-6583 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jeremy Alan Williams, Petitioner |
v. |
Maurice Warrior, Interim Warden |
|
Docketed: | October 20, 2015 |
Linked with 15A153 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-5190) |
Decision Date: | April 10, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 21, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 3 2015 |
Application (15A153) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2015 to October 18, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Aug 7 2015 |
Application (15A153) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 18, 2015. |
Oct 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 19, 2015) |
Nov 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Maurice Warrior, Interim Warden in opposition filed. |
Dec 2 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Jeremy Alan Williams filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|