Docket for 15-6258
No. 15-6258 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
August Cassano, Petitioner |
v. |
Ohio |
|
Docketed: | September 24, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Ohio, Richland County |
Case Nos.: | (12CA55) |
Decision Date: | April 11, 2013 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 24, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 21 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 26, 2015) |
Dec 2 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 31, 2015. |
Dec 30 2015 |
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
Jan 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|