Docket for 15-6191
No. 15-6191 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard E. Lynch, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 22, 2015 |
Linked with 15A50 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-15188) |
Decision Date: | January 8, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 20, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 7 2015 |
Application (15A50) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 19, 2015 to September 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 14 2015 |
Application (15A50) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 17, 2015. |
Sep 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2015) |
Oct 7 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 23, 2015. |
Nov 23 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|